+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Insurance and Banking Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/11/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 3/11/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/4/2014
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Insurance and Banking Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 2/25/2014
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 2/25/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 2/18/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 2/18/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 2/4/2014
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 2/4/2014
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 1/21/2014
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 2014
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/26/2013
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/20/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/13/2013
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0145
Amendment 1-0 to HB1265
+ − Vote
March 20, 2013: INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor