+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 479
- Effective date(s) 01/01/2020
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 18, Nays 11, PNV 2
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0126)
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA0464)
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0463)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA0499)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0490)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0489)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0021)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 62, Nays 31, PNV 1
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary for 2/27/2019
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
- Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (8)
May 2, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 2
April 30, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 2
April 24, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
April 24, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 27, 2019: HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
February 20, 2019: HOUSE CONSTITUTIONAL PROTECTIONS & SENTENCING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor