+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Failed In s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/19/2014
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to summer study
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/27/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/27/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.