+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary for 1/29/2020
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Action def. in Judiciary to First Calendar of 2020
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019
- Action def. in Judiciary to 4/10/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/3/2019
- Action def. in Judiciary to 4/3/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/27/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
March 19, 2019: HOUSE CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor