+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 732
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2014
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/3/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/26/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Health Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/12/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/4/2014
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/4/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/25/2014
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/11/2014
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to first calendar in 2014
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/26/2013
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to last calendar
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2013
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee-- Health
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0881
Amendment 1-0 to HB1257
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 26, 2014: HEALTH COMMITTEE
March 12, 2014: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
March 4, 2014: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor