+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 414
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Reset on cal. for 4/20/15
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/14/2015
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/31/2015
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (13)
April 16, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 16, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 16, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 14, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 14, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 14, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 8, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 8, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 8, 2015: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 31, 2015: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 31, 2015: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 25, 2015: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
March 25, 2015: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor