+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019
- Placed behind the budget
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 4/10/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 4/2/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/26/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- No Action Taken
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2019: HOUSE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
April 2, 2019: HOUSE CURRICULUM, TESTING, & INNOVATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor