+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
- Pub. Ch. 452
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- H. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 70, Nays 22 PNV 0 HB1233
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/26/21
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 23, Nays 7, PNV 3
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0140)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 65, Nays 24, PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0086)
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/13/2021
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/7/2021
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/24/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/17/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/9/2021
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
April 26, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 24
April 21, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 19, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 24
April 19, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 19, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 24
April 13, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 7, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 17, 2021: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 9, 2021: K-12 SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor