+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 170
- Effective date(s) 04/16/2015
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 1
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/26/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/19/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/17/2015
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/11/2015
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (8)
March 26, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 26, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 26, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 26, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
March 17, 2015: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 17, 2015: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 11, 2015: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
March 11, 2015: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor