+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 554
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2018
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
- H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 97, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB1227
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/1/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0561)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/10/2017
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2017
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/28/2017
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/21/2017
- Meeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/22/17
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
March 1, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1
- Yeas: 96
February 5, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 9
April 10, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
April 10, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
April 10, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
March 28, 2017: HOUSE EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 28, 2017: EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 22, 2017: HOUSE EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
March 22, 2017: EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor