+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 388
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/19
- Reset on next avail. cal.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/2/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Action def. in Transportation Committee to 4/2/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/26/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 24, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 18, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 2, 2019: HOUSE TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 19, 2019: HOUSE SAFETY & FUNDING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor