+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Re-ref. to Consumer Subcommittee
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer Subcommittee for 1/29/2020
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c First Calendar of 2020
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Consumer Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor