+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 488
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 372
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2013
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/16/2013
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to Next Calendar
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/10/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2013
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/2/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in Local Government Committee to 4/2/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/26/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in Local Government Committee to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/19/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/13/2013
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0319
Amendment 1-0 to HB1208