+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee to 3/10/2020
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/3/2020
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction