+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 1, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1087
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 4/21/2022
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2022
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/20/2022
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2022
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/12/2022
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Action def. in Local Government Committee to 4/12/2022
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/5/2022
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Action def. in Local Government Committee to 4/5/2022
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/29/2022
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/20/2021
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 4/14/2021
- Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 4/14/2021
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 4/7/2021
- Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 4/7/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/31/2021
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
April 21, 2022: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 20, 2022: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 19, 2022: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
April 12, 2022: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
April 14, 2021: HOUSE ELECTIONS & CAMPAIGN FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
C. Sexton
Type:
Primary Sponsor