+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 117
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec. for pass. ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/15/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/9/2021
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/3/2021
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee -- Government Operations for Review
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 22, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 15, 2021: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 9, 2021: HOUSE COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
March 3, 2021: HOUSE BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor