+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
- Pub. Ch. 402
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0387)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0017)
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/3/2021
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2021
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
- P2C held on desk.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On November 30, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 25, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
March 25, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 3, 2021: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 24, 2021: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor