+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/19
- Reset on cal. for 4/11/19
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/19
- Reset on next avail. cal.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/19/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Banking & Investments Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Banking & Investments Subcommittee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction