+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 197
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/6/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/2/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/31/2015
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/17/2015
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/10/2015
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.