+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 275
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2017
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2017
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/28/2017
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- P1C.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.