+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Failed in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/23/2016
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/23/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/16/2016
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 4/1/2015
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 4/1/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/25/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/18/2015
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/18/2015
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/11/2015
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee--Consumer & Human Resources Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 23, 2016: INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1