+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 320
- Effective date(s) 05/13/2013
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0180)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2013
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/20/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/12/2013
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0180
Amendment 1-0 to HB0116
+ − Votes (5)
April 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 30
March 28, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97
March 21, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 20, 2013: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE
March 12, 2013: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor