+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/19/2017
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/11/2017
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/11/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/4/2017
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/28/2017
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
- Sponsor change.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2017: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
April 11, 2017: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor