+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/30/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor