+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Failed In s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/27/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/26/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2013
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.