+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/19/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Sponsor change.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor