+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/24/2021
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to 3/24/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/10/2021
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee--Health
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor