+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 159
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 1, PNV 1
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0168)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0070)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/12/2019
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 28, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 21, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
March 21, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 12, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 6, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
+ − Sponsors (67)
Type:
Primary Sponsor