+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/20/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/13/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/13/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/6/2013
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor