+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 409
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2013
- Reset on Reg cal. for 4/18/13
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2013
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2013
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2013
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/10/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2013
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 4/2/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 4/2/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/26/2013
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/20/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/13/2013
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 11, 2013: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
April 10, 2013: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
April 2, 2013: INSURANCE AND BANKING COMMITTEE
March 20, 2013: INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor