+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 916
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2016
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2016
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/5/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/30/2016
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/15/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/8/2016
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.