+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 463
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2019; 07/01/2020
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0386)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0373)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 4/10/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c House Higher Education Subcommittee
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 29, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9