+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 215
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2013
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2013
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/27/2013
- Action Def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/27/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/20/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/13/2013
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
March 28, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 27, 2013: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
March 13, 2013: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor