+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration & Planning
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/7/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/31/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/31/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/24/2015
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 31, 2015: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
March 31, 2015: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
March 31, 2015: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor