+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 418
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2017
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/2/2017
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/2/2017
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Move to Heel
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to next Calendar
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/25/2017
- Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/25/2017
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/18/2017
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/18/2017
- Move to Heel
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/11/2017
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/5/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.