+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 432
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/18/2013
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2013
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2013
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2013
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed Behind the Budget
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/27/2013
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/12/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/6/2013
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (4)
April 18, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 18, 2013: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
March 12, 2013: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
March 6, 2013: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor