+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 443
- Effective date(s) 05/22/2019
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/6/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (5)
April 29, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 11
March 18, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97
March 18, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 6, 2019: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 26, 2019: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor