+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 381
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2013
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/16/2013
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to Next Calendar
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to Next Calendar
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2013
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/9/2013
- Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/9/2013
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/3/2013
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/2/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/26/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2013
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 4/2/2013
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/26/2013
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0398
Amendment 1-0 to HB1064
+ − Votes (3)
April 16, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 9, 2013: EDUCATION COMMITTEE
March 26, 2013: EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor