+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 359
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2017
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0448)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0359)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 85, Nays 2, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2017
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/11/2017
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
May 1, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 9
April 20, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 20, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 2
April 20, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 11, 2017: HOUSE TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 11, 2017: TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 5, 2017: TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
April 5, 2017: HOUSE TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor