+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Failed for lack of second in: State Government Subcommittee
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/23/2016
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/23/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/16/2016
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2016
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/25/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor