+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 05/26/2021
- Pub. Ch. 561
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0399)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 1
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0023)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/9/2021
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/3/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 3, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 11
March 25, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 9, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 3, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor