+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 425
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2013
- Reset on Next Available Reg. cal.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2013
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/16/2013
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/16/2013
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/15/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/27/2013
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/19/2013
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0510
Amendment 1-0 to HB1038
+ − Votes (5)
April 16, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 16, 2013: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
April 15, 2013: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
February 27, 2013: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
February 19, 2013: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor