+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 2016
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/25/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/24/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/24/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/17/2015
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/17/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/10/2015
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor