+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 396
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Reset on cal. for 4/20/15
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/14/2015
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/8/2015
- Action def. in Health Committee to 4/8/2015
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor change.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/1/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/24/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/17/2015
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/17/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/10/2015
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/10/2015
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/3/2015
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee--Government Operations for review
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.