+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/27/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2013
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor