+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 194
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/9/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Action def. in State Committee to 4/9/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/2/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Action def. in State Committee to 4/2/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/26/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Action def. in State Committee to 3/26/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/19/2019
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
- Ref. to State Committee
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
April 15, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 9, 2019: HOUSE STATE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 13, 2019: HOUSE DEPARTMENTS & AGENCIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor