+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 293
- Effective date(s) 03/01/2018
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 2
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0237)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 78, Nays 14, PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0349)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0181)
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2017
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 4/11/2017
- Re-ref. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2017
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/28/2017
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
- Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/22/2017
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
April 24, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
April 17, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 17, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 17, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 14