+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/2/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 4/3/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/27/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/27/2013
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to last calendar
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/27/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor