+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 10
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/25/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/21/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Committee for 2/13/2019
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/6/2019
- Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Committee
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
February 13, 2019: HOUSE LOCAL COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 6, 2019: HOUSE PROPERTY & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee
February 6, 2019: PROPERTY & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor