+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/29/2017
- Move to Heel
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/22/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/22/2017
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor